OR SB622 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires at least 60 percent of dollar value of grants awarded from Levee Project Grant Fund to be used to provide assistance with levee projects to rural or distressed areas. Authorizes issuance of $10 million in lottery bonds for deposit in Levee Project Grant Fund to be used to provide grants for levee projects.] Requires at least 60 percent of dollar value of grants awarded from Levee Project Grant Fund to be used to provide assistance with levee projects to rural or distressed areas. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to levees; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 27, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 654, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Zika. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 4--Dexter, Hayden, Smith G, Wilde; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Morgan. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2021-06-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development, then Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |