OR SB621 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Upholds, under certain circumstances, local laws concerning local community oversight board established to oversee disciplinary matters concerning law enforcement officers, notwithstanding collective bargaining laws that require bargaining over such matters. Upholds, under certain circumstances, local laws concerning local community oversight board established to oversee disciplinary matters concerning law enforcement officers, notwithstanding collective bargaining laws that require bargaining over such matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to effect of collective bargaining laws on local laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-07HouseThird reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 19--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-20HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-05SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
2021-04-05SenateThird reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Boquist, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Gelser, Girod, Thomsen.
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-16SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback