OR SB621 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Upholds, under certain circumstances, local laws concerning local community oversight board established to oversee disciplinary matters concerning law enforcement officers, notwithstanding collective bargaining laws that require bargaining over such matters. Upholds, under certain circumstances, local laws concerning local community oversight board established to oversee disciplinary matters concerning law enforcement officers, notwithstanding collective bargaining laws that require bargaining over such matters.
Title
Relating to effect of collective bargaining laws on local laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] |
Rep. Andrea Valderrama [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 402, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 19--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Boquist, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Gelser, Girod, Thomsen. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |