OR SB620 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals obligation of persons on supervision to pay supervision fees. Provides that monthly supervision fee for person under supervision of community corrections program is not automatically required, but may be required by program.] Repeals obligation of persons on supervision to pay supervision fees.
Title
Relating to supervision fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 653, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 18--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Evans, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Bonham, Smith G. |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 23, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-06-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | House | Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred. |
2021-05-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-11 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 23; Absent, 4--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Boquist, Gorsek, Thomsen. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |