OR SB619 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Revenue to establish program to pay reparations to Black Oregonians who can demonstrate heritage in slavery and who submit application no later than December 31, 2022. Directs Department of Revenue to establish program to pay reparations to Black Oregonians who can demonstrate heritage in slavery and who submit application no later than December 31, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reparations for slavery.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-03-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation, then Finance and Revenue.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback