OR SB617 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Board of Education to ensure that certain academic content standards include sufficient instruction on histories, contributions and perspectives of individuals who are African American and to ensure that academic content standards in English include meaningful instruction on literary contributions of African American authors. Directs State Board of Education to ensure that certain academic content standards include sufficient instruction on histories, contributions and perspectives of individuals who are African American and to ensure that academic content standards in English include meaningful instruction on literary contributions of African American authors. Requires textbook and instructional materials to adequately address roles in and contributions to economic, political and social development of Oregon and United States by men and women who are African American.
Title
Relating to inclusive education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB617 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB617/Introduced |