OR SB614 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits law enforcement agency to collect and maintain information about person's political, religious or social views or activities if information was collected and maintained for lawful purpose, including activities carried out in accordance with policy for officer-worn video cameras. Establishes exception, for video cameras worn by law enforcement officer, to prohibition on law enforcement agency collecting or maintaining information about person's political, religious or social views or activities.] Establishes circumstances where law enforcement officer may begin recording from video camera worn by officer without developing reasonable suspicion or probable cause.] Permits law enforcement agency to collect and maintain information about person's political, religious or social views or activities if information was collected and maintained for lawful purpose, including activities carried out in accordance with policy for officer-worn video cameras. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to law enforcement officer recordings; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-04-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Campos, Golden. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Campos, Girod, Golden, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 2--Findley, Gorsek. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |