OR SB612 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for distribution to Pueblo Unido PDX for facilitating creation of certain language proficiency evaluations. Establishes Indigenous Language Justice Fund. Requires nonprofit organization in this state to serve as fiscal agent to receive disbursement of moneys for purposes related to supporting Indigenous languages interpretation in this state. Requires fiscal agent to annually report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to language interpretation services.] Appropriates moneys to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for distribution to Pueblo Unido PDX for facilitating creation of certain language proficiency evaluations. Appropriates moneys to department for distribution to Oregon Worker Relief for payments to individuals who provide interpretation services of specified languages. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to Indigenous languages; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Sen. Kayse Jama [D] | Rep. Andrea Valderrama [D] | Rep. Annessa Hartman [D] |
Sen. James Manning [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |