OR SB605 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that, if rural fire protection district contains lands that are within seven road miles of fire station within district or brought within seven road miles of fire station within district by new road and that are not subject to assessments for fire protection by district, county board must initiate annexation of lands upon request by district. Provides that, if rural fire protection district contains improved] lands , or new improvements,] that are within seven road miles of fire station within district or brought within seven road miles of fire station within district by new road and that are not subject to assessments for fire protection by district, county board must initiate by resolution] annexation of territory containing] lands upon request by district. Requires] Exempts annexation from requirements that hearing and election on proposed annexation be conducted as is required for district formation proceedings. Directs county board to establish process for annexation. Provides that annexed territory is] lands are subject to outstanding indebtedness of district, permanent rate limit established by district and local option taxes imposed by district. Provides that annexed lands may be subject to assessments for fire protection by district and certain fee only if or when lands are improved. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to annexing territory to rural fire protection districts; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Anderson, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Linthicum. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |