OR SB601 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases threshold for estimated cost at which construction project sites must provide sanitary facilities by changing amount that triggers requirement from $1 million to $2 million. Requires Director of the Department of Consumer and Business Services to adjust threshold amount based on change in Consumer Price Index. Replaces requirement for warm water and soap with requirement for method to wash or sanitize hands.
Title
Relating to requirement that construction project sites provide sanitary facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB601 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB601/Introduced |