OR SB60 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, June 4, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, June 4, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows acupuncturists and podiatric physicians to claim liability limitation for provision of health care services without compensation. Allows acupuncturists and podiatric physicians to claim liability limitation for provision of health care services without compensation. Requires biennial registration by health practitioners claiming liability limitation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care professional liability limitation; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, June 4, 2019. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 227, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Drazan. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 3--Clem, Holvey, Rayfield; Excused, 2--Boles, Helm; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-07 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Carried over to 02-19 by unanimous consent. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |