OR SB595 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusts allocation percentages of net revenue from new or increased local transient lodging tax to allow up to 30 percent of such revenue to be used to fund affordable workforce housing. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to local transient lodging taxes; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Housing, then Finance and Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |