OR SB594 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restores availability of tax credit for employment-related child care expenses and extends credit sunset. Increases amount of available child care credit by doubling applicable percentage of taxpayer's child care expenses allowed as credit. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2016, and before January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a tax credit for child care expenses; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Tax Credits. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB594 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB594/Introduced |