OR SB591 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Bureau of Labor and Industries to study issue of labor trafficking in this state. Requires Bureau of Labor and Industries to study issue of labor trafficking in this state. Directs bureau to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to business and labor not later than September 15, 2024.
Title
Relating to labor trafficking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |