OR SB59 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of lottery bonds for Connect Oregon. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to funding Connect Oregon transportation projects; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Transportation, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |