OR SB588 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Outdoor Therapy Grant Program within State Parks and Recreation Department for purpose of awarding grants to enhance outdoor environmental, ecological, agricultural or other natural resource-based therapy programs serving residents of this state. Establishes Outdoor Therapy Grant Program Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to department for purposes of grant program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to outdoor therapy programs; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-04-15SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-04-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-04-03SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-27SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Health Care.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback