OR SB586 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health care practitioner to exercise proper degree of care to preserve health and life of child born alive after abortion or attempted abortion. Requires health care practitioner to exercise proper degree of care to preserve health and life of child born alive after abortion or attempted abortion. Requires health care practitioner to ensure child born alive is transported to hospital. Creates crime for failure to exercise proper standard of care, punishable by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both. Allows specified person to bring civil action for damages and equitable relief against health care practitioner for failure to exercise proper standard of care. Directs court to award attorney fees to prevailing plaintiff. Allows court to order identity or personally identifiable information of specified person protected from disclosure.
Title
Relating to abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on < |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |