OR SB585 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to establish Responsible Cannabis Retailer Program to prevent sales of marijuana items to minors. Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to establish Responsible Cannabis Retailer Program to assist marijuana retailers in maintaining compliance with cannabis laws and rules] prevent sales of marijuana items to minors. Prohibits commission from imposing certain forms of discipline on marijuana retailer that participates in program if employee of marijuana retailer sells marijuana item to minor. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to Responsible Cannabis Retailer Program; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |