OR SB584 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to provide medical assistance to employed individuals with disabilities without regard to individuals' income or resources. Requires Oregon Health Authority] Department of Human Services to provide medical assistance to employed individuals with disabilities without regard to individuals' income or resources. Allows consideration of income when determining cost-sharing for program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to employed individuals with disabilities; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Dan Rayfield [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Charles Riley [D] |
Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |