OR SB583 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits Department of Environmental Quality and State Department of Agriculture from issuing or renewing license or permit to allow construction or operation of new industrial dairy, addition to or expansion of existing industrial dairy or addition to or expansion of dairy that would cause dairy to become industrial dairy. Prohibits Department of Environmental Quality and State Department of Agriculture from issuing or renewing license or permit to allow construction or operation of new industrial dairy, addition to or expansion of existing industrial dairy or addition to or expansion of dairy that would cause dairy to become industrial dairy. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to industrial dairies; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-04-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback