OR SB581 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies applicability of earned reduction of supervision changes in House Bill 2172 (2021). Requires Department of Corrections to adopt rules requiring supervising officers to provide to eligible persons on supervision quarterly updates on progress toward earning reduction in supervision.] Modifies applicability of earned reduction of supervision changes in House Bill 2172 (2021).
Title
Relating to earned reduction in supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2024. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 75, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-05-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 28--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Conrad, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Evans, Gomberg, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Levy B, Levy E, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Morgan, Neron, Osborne, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Smith G, Stout, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 1--Javadi. |
2023-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2023-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-04-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Bonham, Findley, Girod, Hayden, Knopp, Smith DB; Excused, 1--Robinson. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Carried over to 03-01 by unanimous consent. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |