OR SB58 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Department of Environmental Quality to add fee to credit card transactions. Authorizes Department of Environmental Quality to add fee to credit card transactions. Allows department to establish and collect surcharge on invoices generated by environmental data management system. Appropriates surcharge moneys to department for maintenance and operation of system. Becomes operative on January 1, 2022.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.].

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to charges imposed by the Department of Environmental Quality.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-20SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-08-20SenateChapter 568, 2021 Laws.
2021-07-19SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-26HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-25HouseThird reading. Carried by Pham. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 15--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Cate, Evans, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Morgan, Owens, Post, Reschke, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 4--Dexter, Hayden, Smith G, Wilde.
2021-06-24HouseRules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-24HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2021-06-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-06-23HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-23HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2021-06-18SenateWork Session held.
2021-06-16SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-16SenateWork Session held.
2021-06-10SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2021-03-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2021-03-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-02-25SenateWork Session held.
2021-01-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB58
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31145
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33063
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=532892
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533959

Bill Comments

feedback