OR SB58 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Effective date, June 22, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Long Term Care Ombudsman to appoint Residential Facilities Ombudsman within office of Long Term Care Ombudsman. Specifies duties of Residential Facilities Ombudsman. Renames Residential Facilities Advisory Committee as Residential Ombudsman and Public Guardianship Advisory Board. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Long Term Care Ombudsman; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, but with amendments and requesting referral to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-04SenateEffective date, June 22, 2017.
2017-07-04SenateChapter 441, 2017 Laws.
2017-06-22SenateGovernor signed.
2017-06-16HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-06-15SenatePresident signed.
2017-06-14SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 30.
2017-06-12HouseThird reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 51; Excused, 7--Bentz, Boone, Helm, McLane, Noble, Smith G, Witt; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Barker, Stark.
2017-06-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-06HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2017-05-31HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
2017-05-25HouseWork Session held.
2017-05-23HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-05-18HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2017-05-18HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-05-17SenateThird reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2017-05-16SenateSecond reading.
2017-05-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2017-05-10SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-04-24SenateReferred to Rules.
2017-04-24SenateRecommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and requesting referral to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-04-17SenateWork Session held.
2017-04-12SenateWork Session held.
2017-02-13SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Human Services.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB58
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/House%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB58/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/25289
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/25832
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=409384
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26142
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=415717
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=416185

Bill Comments 750

feedback