OR SB58 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Oregon Natural Areas Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Oregon Natural Areas Plan.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-22 Effective date, January 1, 2012.
2011-06-21 Chapter 319, 2011 Laws.
2011-06-14 Governor signed.
2011-06-08 Co-Speakers signed.
2011-06-03 President signed.
2011-06-01 Third reading. Carried by Cowan. Passed. Ayes, 60.
2011-05-31 Second reading.
2011-05-27 Recommendation: Do pass.
2011-05-23 Referred to Ways and Means.
2011-05-23 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.
2011-05-19 Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 30.
2011-05-18 Second reading.
2011-05-17 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2011-05-13 Work Session held.
2011-05-09 Returned to Full Committee.
2011-05-09 Work Session held.
2011-04-26 Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2011-02-09 Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2011-02-09 Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
2011-02-03 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2011-01-14 Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2011-01-10 Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback