OR SB579 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows persons convicted of felony to register to vote, update voter registration and vote in elections while incarcerated. Allows persons convicted of felony to register to vote, update voter registration and vote in elections while incarcerated. Provides that person does not forfeit and may not be deprived of right to vote while incarcerated. Specifies that person's residence is where person resided prior to incarceration. Becomes operative June 1, 2026.
Title
Relating to voting by adults in custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Rescission of the subsequent referral denied by Order of the President. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments, Be Printed Engrossed and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng). |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |