OR SB573 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Teacher Standards and Practices Commission to immediately suspend license or registration of teacher or administrator if commission determines there is reasonable cause to support report that teacher or administrator engaged in specified behavior. Directs education provider to place school employee on paid administrative leave if education provider determines there is reasonable cause to support report that school employee engaged in specified behavior. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to investigations of school employees; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB573 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB573/Introduced |