OR SB5723 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-20 - Governor signed with line-item veto.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Emergency Board for allocations during biennium. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Emergency Board for allocations during biennium. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to specified state agencies for biennial expenses. Modifies certain biennial appropriations made from General Fund to specified state agencies and Emergency Board. Establishes and modifies limitations on expenditures for certain biennial expenses for specified state agencies. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-20SenateGovernor signed with line-item veto.
2020-08-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-08-13SenatePresident signed.
2020-08-10HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Keny-Guyer, Williams.
2020-08-10HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 22--Barker, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Clem, Evans, Hayden, Helt, Hernandez, Keny-Guyer, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Neron, Owens, Post, Prusak, Reschke, Stark, Wallan, Williams, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 3--Barreto, Mitchell, Power.
2020-08-10HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-08-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-08-10HouseReferred to The Second Special Session of 2020.
2020-08-10HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-08-10SenateVote explanation filed by Golden.
2020-08-10SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Fagan, Girod, Hass, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Hansell, Olsen.
2020-08-10SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-08-10SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-08-10SenateWork Session held.
2020-08-10SenateReferred to The Second Special Session of 2020.
2020-08-10SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback