OR SB5701 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Approves certain fees adopted or modified by state agencies. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |