OR SB567 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Includes as unlawful practice medical provider's denial of treatment that is likely to benefit patient based on patient's race, color, national origin, sex, sexual orientation, gender identity, age or disability. Includes as unlawful practice medical provider's denial of treatment that is likely to benefit patient based on patient's race, color, national origin, sex, sexual orientation, gender identity, age or disability. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to discrimination in provision of health care; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 584, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Dexter. |
2021-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 16--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-23 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-21 | House | Rules suspended. First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Johnson, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |