OR SB566 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, May 21, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, May 21, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes term "mentally defective" from statutes defining sexual offenses. Removes term "mentally defective" from statutes defining sexual offenses. Provides that person is incapable of consenting to sexual act if person is incapable of appraising nature of person's conduct. Directs trier of fact to consider certain criteria when determining whether victim had] Specifies meaning of capability of appraising nature of victim's] person's conduct. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to consent; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] |
Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, May 21, 2021. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 82, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 8--Dexter, Drazan, Evans, Lively, Nearman, Ruiz, Stark, Valderrama. |
2021-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-10 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |