OR SB565 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, May 21, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, May 21, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "slayer" to include individuals who are found responsible or guilty except for insanity of taking person's life. Modifies definition of "slayer" to include individuals who are found responsible or guilty except for insanity of taking person's life. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to slayers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, May 21, 2021. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 81, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wallan. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Clem, Hayden, Lively, Nearman, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McLain. |
2021-05-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-11 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Robinson; Excused, 1--Linthicum. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |