OR SB563 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, May 21, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, May 21, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies laws relating to youth suicide intervention and prevention to include children 5 to 10 years of age. Modifies laws relating to youth suicide intervention and prevention to include children 5 to 10 years of age. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to youth suicide; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] | Sen. Rob Wagner [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] |
Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, May 21, 2021. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 80, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 8--Dexter, Drazan, Evans, Lively, Nearman, Ruiz, Stark, Valderrama. |
2021-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-10 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-04-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Thomsen. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |