OR SB562 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Incorporates certain provisions of federal Indian Child Welfare Act into Oregon laws relating to youth offenders adjudicated for status offenses and to adoptions. Declares that person may not be disqualified from service as child welfare service provider based on certain traits. Declares that child, ward or youth may not be prohibited from, disciplined for or retaliated against for publicly or privately speaking about child's, ward's or youth's experience receiving child welfare services.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.] Incorporates certain provisions of federal Indian Child Welfare Act into Oregon laws relating to youth offenders adjudicated for status offenses and to adoptions. Enhances state protections for Indian children in certain situations. Authorizes juvenile court to approve tribal customary adoption as permanency option for wards who are Indian children. Modifies court process to determine whether there is reason to know child is Indian child. Makes technical corrections to child welfare laws involving Indian children. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to children; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-14SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Robinson.
2021-06-07HouseThird reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Zika.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-05-19HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-26HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-17SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-03-17SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 5--Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen.
2021-03-11SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-11SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-02-25SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-18SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-16SenatePublic Hearing Cancelled.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB562
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB562/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB562/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB562/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB562/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31151
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=504907
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32575
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=528134
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=528900

Bill Comments 750

feedback