OR SB560 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurer and health care service contractor to count payments made on behalf of enrollee for costs of care toward enrollee's out-of-pocket maximum or cost-sharing. Requires insurer and health care service contractor to count payments made on behalf of enrollee for costs of care toward enrollee's out-of-pocket maximum or cost-sharing.
Title
Relating to the cost of health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |