OR SB56 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to charges assessed by the Oregon Business Development Department.
Title
Relating to charges assessed by the Oregon Business Development Department.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Effective date, January 1, 2012. | |
2011-05-27 | Chapter 155, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-27 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-20 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-17 | President signed. | |
2011-05-16 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Hicks. | |
2011-05-16 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith G. | |
2011-05-16 | Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Brewer, Cameron, Conger, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Schaufler, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard, Speaker Hanna; Excused, 2--Lindsay, Thompson. | |
2011-05-12 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-11 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-10 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-05-09 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2011-04-27 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-04-26 | Johnson declared potential conflict of interest. | |
2011-04-26 | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 21; nays, 8--Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Telfer, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--George. | |
2011-04-25 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-21 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-04-18 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-11 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-22 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |