OR SB559 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes calculation of final average salary for purposes of Public Employees Retirement System to use five years of salary instead of three years, for salary paid on and after January 1, 2018. Directs Public Employees Retirement Board to recalculate employer contribution rates to reflect savings attributable to Act. Provides for expedited review of Act by Supreme Court upon petition by adversely affected party.
Title
Relating to the calculation of final average salary under the Public Employees Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, but with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by Order of the President. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |