OR SB5564 | 2010 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date, March 29, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-29 Effective date, March 29, 2010.
2010-03-29 Chapter 103, 2010 Laws.
2010-03-29 Governor signed.
2010-02-25 Speaker signed.
2010-02-25 President signed.
2010-02-24 Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 22--Bentz, Bruun, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Gilman, Hanna, Huffman, Kennemer, Krieger, Maurer, Olson, Richardson, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Tomei.
2010-02-24 Second reading.
2010-02-23 Recommendation: Do pass.
2010-02-23 Referred to Ways and Means.
2010-02-23 First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2010-02-23 Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Atkinson, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Whitsett.
2010-02-23 Second reading.
2010-02-23 (Amendments distributed.)
2010-02-23 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2010-02-22 Work Session held.
2010-02-04 Referred to Ways and Means.
2010-02-04 Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback