OR SB556 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies that on-site inspections must be in person for health care facilities, home health agencies, residential care facilities, adult foster homes, hospice programs and qualified residential treatment programs. Specifies that on-site inspections must be in person for child-caring agencies, proctor foster homes, private residential boarding schools, foster homes, youth offender foster homes,] health care facilities, home health agencies, residential care facilities, adult foster homes, developmental disability child foster homes,] hospice programs and qualified residential treatment programs. Authorizes Governor by executive order to allow online inspections during period of statewide emergency. Allows licenses, certificates or other authorizations to be extended for up to six months during period of statewide emergency. After six months, prohibits renewal of licenses, certificates or other authorizations without in-person site inspection.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to in-person inspections; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Motion to Refer (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Ruiz. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Drazan, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-26HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-19HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-04-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-21SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Gelser.
2021-04-21SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Girod; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard.
2021-04-21SenateMotion to refer to Committee on Ways and Means failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 17--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard.
2021-04-19SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-06SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-01SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB556
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB556/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB556/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB556/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB556/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31812
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=517154
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=517156
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32570
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=526872

Bill Comments 750

feedback