OR SB5546 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Effective date, July 27, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by State Board of Pharmacy. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to _____ for biennial expenses.] Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by _______.] Limits biennial expenditures of _____ from federal funds.] Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by State Board of Pharmacy. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-03SenateEffective date, July 27, 2023.
2023-08-03SenateChapter 488, 2023 Laws.
2023-07-27SenateGovernor signed.
2023-06-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-23SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-21HouseThird reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 32; Nays, 19--Andersen, Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Elmer, Hartman, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy E, Lewis, McIntire, Morgan, Neron, Nguyen H, Owens, Ruiz, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 9--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Diehl, Levy B, Nguyen D, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Wright.
2023-06-20HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 21, 2023 Calendar.
2023-06-20HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2023-06-20HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-06-20HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-06-20HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-06-16SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Hansell.
2023-06-16SenateThird reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 2--Girod, Knopp; Absent, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Woods.
2023-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2023-05-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-05-12SenateWork Session held.
2023-05-09SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2023-05-09SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-03-27SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2023-02-02SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-02-02SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB5546
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5546/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5546/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5546/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5546/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24748
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24915
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73795
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272705
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272713
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272714
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273633
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273647
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273659
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79390
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79407
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79429
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79573
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80621
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35796
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=586916
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=588287

Bill Comments

feedback