OR SB554 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates process by which person may file post-conviction relief petition due to currently available relevant forensic scientific evidence at any time after conviction. Creates process by which person may file post-conviction relief petition due to currently available relevant forensic scientific evidence at any time after conviction.
Title
Relating to forensic science.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] |
Sen. James Manning [D] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Sen. Dennis Linthicum [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |