OR SB5538 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Secretary of State for certain biennial expenses. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Secretary of State for certain biennial expenses. Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Secretary of State. Limits certain biennial expenditures by Secretary of State from federal funds. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Secretary of State; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-18 | Senate | Effective date, July 14, 2021. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Chapter 505, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Levy, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Wallan. |
2021-06-22 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by McLain, Moore-Green. |
2021-06-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 22, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Boquist, Findley, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |