OR SB5538 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by State Board of Tax Practitioners. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the State Board of Tax Practitioners; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2017. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 376, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-05-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Linthicum; excused, 1--Gelser. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |