OR SB5534 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Effective date, July 27, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Public Utility Commission of Oregon. Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Public Utility Commission of Oregon. Limits biennial expenditures by commission from federal funds. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financial administration of the Public Utility Commission of Oregon; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-03SenateEffective date, July 27, 2023.
2023-08-03SenateChapter 483, 2023 Laws.
2023-07-27SenateGovernor signed.
2023-06-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-23SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-21HouseThird reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 15--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Conrad, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Lewis, McIntire, Morgan, Owens, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 9--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Diehl, Levy B, Nguyen D, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield.
2023-06-20HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 21, 2023 Calendar.
2023-06-20HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2023-06-20HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-06-20HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-06-20HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-06-16SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Hansell.
2023-06-16SenateThird reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 2--Findley, Girod; Absent, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Woods.
2023-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2023-05-09SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-05-05SenateWork Session held.
2023-04-20SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2023-04-20SenateWork Session held.
2023-04-03SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-23SenatePublic Hearing Cancelled.
2023-02-02SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2023-02-02SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-02-02SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB5534
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5534/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5534/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5534/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5534/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24558
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24709
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73783
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269016
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270390
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271088
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272442
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272651
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79063
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79078
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79163
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80612
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35564
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=586905
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=588268

Bill Comments

feedback