OR SB5533 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Effective date, July 27, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Public Safety Standards and Training for debt service. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Public Safety Standards and Training for debt service. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from federal funds. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Public Safety Standards and Training; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-03SenateEffective date, July 27, 2023.
2023-08-03SenateChapter 482, 2023 Laws.
2023-07-27SenateGovernor signed.
2023-06-22HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-22SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-20HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lewis. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Boshart Davis, Diehl, Elmer, Nelson, Reschke, Wright.
2023-06-20HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2023-06-20HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-06-20HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-06-20HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-06-16SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2023-06-16SenateThird reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 22; Absent, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Woods.
2023-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-06-02SenateWork Session held.
2023-05-24SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2023-05-24SenateWork Session held.
2023-02-16SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-15SenateInformational Meeting held.
2023-02-02SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2023-02-02SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-02-02SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB5533
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5533/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5533/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5533/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5533/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25094
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25216
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73782
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261165
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261582
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274472
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275150
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80183
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275353
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275390
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80260
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80578
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80611
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36009
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=586904
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=587705

Bill Comments

feedback