OR SB5533 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for debt service on outstanding general obligation bonds sold pursuant to Article XI-G of Oregon Constitution for Oregon Health and Science University. Limits biennial expenditures by Oregon Department of Administrative Services from Oregon Health and Science University Bond Fund. Limits biennial expenditures by Oregon Department of Administrative Services for debt service on outstanding general obligation bonds issued pursuant to Article XI-F (1) of Oregon Constitution for Oregon Health and Science University from moneys received from Oregon Health and Science University. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Department of Administrative Services; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2017. |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Chapter 599, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Evans, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 2--Boone, Heard. |
2017-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |