OR SB5530 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, July 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, July 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of State Police for certain biennial expenses. Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from federal funds for certain purposes. Limits biennial expenditures by department from certain moneys or other revenues allocated to Parks and Natural Resources Fund for certain purposes. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of State Police; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, July 15, 2019. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 568, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2019. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Chapter 568, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Power. |
2019-06-18 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |