OR SB553 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that student who legally entered United States under Compact of Free Association treaty between United States and Republic of Palau, Republic of the Marshall Islands or Federated States of Micronesia and who has not previously established residence in any state or territory of United States other than Oregon qualifies for exemption from nonresident tuition and fees at public universities and is eligible to receive state and university scholarships or other financial aid. Provides that student who legally entered United States under Compact of Free Association treaty between United States and Republic of Palau, Republic of the Marshall Islands or Federated States of Micronesia and who has not previously established residence in any state or territory of United States other than Oregon qualifies for exemption from nonresident tuition and fees at public universities and is eligible to receive state and university scholarships or other financial aid. Provides that student who is refugee or special immigrant visa holder and who has not previously established residence in any state or territory of United States other than Oregon qualifies for exemption from nonresident tuition and fees at public universities and is eligible to receive state and university scholarships or other financial aid. Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to allocate to Eastern Oregon University difference between resident tuition and fees and nonresident tuition and fees for each eligible COFA islander enrolled at university through 2024-2025 academic year. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to higher education tuition; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 27, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 652, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Levy. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 4--Dexter, Hayden, Smith G, Wilde; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Morgan. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2021-06-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |