OR SB5529 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Maintains and reserves lottery revenues available to benefit public purposes during biennium beginning July 1, 2017, in Administrative Services Economic Development Fund. Allocates moneys from fund for biennium beginning July 1, 2017. Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to establish process for quarterly allocations of moneys from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund and Veterans' Services Fund. Transfers certain interest earnings from Oregon Education Fund to Lottery Bond Fund for payments by Department of Education on education lottery bonds. Allocates moneys from Veterans' Services Fund for biennium beginning July 1, 2017. Directs distribution of moneys from Criminal Fine Account. Directs distribution of moneys from Oregon Marijuana Account. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2017. |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Chapter 598, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Buehler, Heard, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke; Excused, 2--Clem, Hayden. |
2017-07-07 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |