OR SB5528 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 536, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 536, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Land Use Board of Appeals for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by board. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Land Use Board of Appeals; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 536, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2017. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed.Ayes, 35; Nays, 18--Barreto, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson; Absent, 1--Piluso; Excused, 5--Bentz, Boone, Hernandez, Nearman, Whisnant; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 19, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-14 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed.Ayes, 23; nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |