OR SB5527 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Effective date, July 27, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Parks and Recreation Department for certain biennial expenses. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Parks and Recreation Department for certain biennial expenses. Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from lottery moneys for certain purposes. Limits biennial expenditures by department from federal funds for certain purposes. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financial administration of the State Parks and Recreation Department; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-03SenateEffective date, July 27, 2023.
2023-08-03SenateChapter 477, 2023 Laws.
2023-07-27SenateGovernor signed.
2023-06-22HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-22SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-20HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Pham K. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused, 6--Boshart Davis, Diehl, Elmer, Nelson, Reschke, Wright.
2023-06-20HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2023-06-20HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-06-20HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-06-20HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-06-16SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2023-06-16SenateThird reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Absent, 6--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Woods.
2023-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-09SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-06-07SenateWork Session held.
2023-06-01SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2023-06-01SenateWork Session held.
2023-02-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-08SenateInformational Meeting held.
2023-02-07SenateInformational Meeting held.
2023-02-02SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2023-02-02SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-02-02SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB5527
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5527/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5527/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5527/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5527/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25205
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25312
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73776
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/260271
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275297
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80327
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275709
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275761
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80418
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80605
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80653
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36045
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=586887
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=587690

Bill Comments

feedback